Global Patent Index - EP 1162402 A2

EP 1162402 A2 2001-12-12 - Method for monitoring the operation of a steam generator for cooking apparatus

Title (en)

Method for monitoring the operation of a steam generator for cooking apparatus

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Überwachen des Betriebes eines Dampferzeugers für Gargeräte

Title (fr)

Procédé de surveillance du fonctionnement d'un générateur de vapeur pour appareil de cuisson

Publication

EP 1162402 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113934 A

Priority

DE 10028595 A

Abstract (en)

Each desired value is recorded and stored in memory as a steamer operates for the first time when it is brand-new and filled with fresh water for the first time. The time gap between two consecutive fresh water refills at boiling temperature for the water in the steamer sets important operating parameters, which are the steamer's water boiling temperature according to geographical height, the filling time between low and high water levels fixed by devices monitoring water levels, the filling time up to the highest level after complete emptying and the speed at which the temperature of the water in the steamer changes.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zum Überwachen des Betriebes eines Dampferzeugers für Gargeräte sieht vor, daß während des Betriebes des Dampferzeugers zumindest ein wesentlicher Parameter desselben gemessen, der gemessene Ist-Wert mit einem Soll-Wert verglichen und das Ergebnis des Vergleichs als Regelgröße oder Steuergröße für die Behebung der Ursache der Abweichung oder für die Abschaltung des Dampferzeugers verwendet wird. Der jeweilige Soll-Wert wird während der ersten Inbetriebnahme des unbeeinträchtigten und mit der ersten Frischwasserfüllung befüllten Dampferzeugers erfaßt und abgespeichert. Wesentliche Betriebsparameter sind der Zeitabstand zwischen zwei aufeinanderfolgenden Frischwasserfüllvorgängen bei Siedetemperatur des Wassers im Dampferzeuger, die Siedetemperatur des Wassers im Dampferzeuger in Abhängigkeit von der geographischen Höhe, die Fülldauer zwischen den von den Füllstandsüberwachungseinrichtungen festgelegte Niedrig- und Hochwasserständen, die Fülldauer bis zum Höchststand nach vollständiger Entleerung des Dampferzeugers und die Temperaturänderungsgeschwindigkeit des Wassers im Dampferzeuger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22B 35/00; A47J 27/04; F22B 1/28; F22B 37/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/28 (2006.01); F22B 35/00 (2006.01); F22B 37/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22B 1/284 (2013.01); F22B 35/00 (2013.01); F22B 37/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0383327 A1 19900822 - LECHMETALL LANDSBERG GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162402 A2 20011212; EP 1162402 A3 20030813; EP 1162402 B1 20070606; AT 364156 T 20070615; DE 10028595 A1 20020103; DE 10028595 B4 20040513; DE 50112586 D1 20070719; ES 2178617 T1 20030101; ES 2178617 T3 20071216

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50112586

- Representative's name: HOEFER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130608

2014-07-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140707

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090607

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090607

2009-09-30 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070607

2009-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080620

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070607

2008-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080307

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070907

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071106

2008-01-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: CONVOTHERM-ELEKTROGERATE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178617 T3

2007-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070724

2007-07-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112586 P 20070719

2007-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2007-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2007-06-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-06-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070606

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RIEFENSTEIN, LUTZ

2007-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHWARZBAECKER, WERNER

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-11-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2002-10-16 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2002-10-04 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI