Global Patent Index - EP 1162404 A2

EP 1162404 A2 2001-12-12 - Gas burner generating an annular flame

Title (en)

Gas burner generating an annular flame

Title (de)

Gasbrenner mit ringförmiger Flamme

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz produisant une flamme annulaire

Publication

EP 1162404 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01106681 A

Priority

IT MI20001302 A

Abstract (en)

A gas burner (1) is associated with a support member such as a cooking hob (2) and comprises a conduit (5) from which there emerges a gas/air mixture, said conduit (5) being operationally associated with a burner body (8). This latter comprises a base portion (9) and a burner head (10) disposed on said portion, said conduit opening (at 6) into the base portion (9), between said portion (9) and said burner head (10) there being present to the side of the burner body (8) an annular gap (16) at which an annular flame is generated when the burner (1) is activated. A cooking hob with at least one such burner is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/06; F23D 14/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2006.01); F23D 14/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/06 (2013.01); F23D 14/583 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162404 A2 20011212; EP 1162404 A3 20020821; IT 1317784 B1 20030715; IT MI20001302 A1 20011210; IT MI20001302 D0 20000609

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-06 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030417

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI