Global Patent Index - EP 1162405 A2

EP 1162405 A2 2001-12-12 - Device for the combustion of renewable particle fuels, in particular wood pellets

Title (en)

Device for the combustion of renewable particle fuels, in particular wood pellets

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbrennen von nachwachsenden, stückeligen Brennstoffen, insbesondere Holzpellets

Title (fr)

Dispositif de combustion pour combustibles renouvelables granulés, notamment boulettes de bois

Publication

EP 1162405 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01890170 A

Priority

AT 9762000 A

Abstract (en)

Device for burning reproductive fuel has a combustion chamber (1) connected to a fan (3) for combustion air. The combustion chamber has a blast nozzle (4) for combustion air and a flame tube (5) with a sensor plate (6). A grinder (8) for fuel in small pieces has a delivery point for the ground up material that discharges into a pressurized or suction pipe for the fan.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung zum Verbrennen von nachwachsenden, stückeligen Brennstoffen, insbesondere Holzpellets, mit einer an ein Gebläse (3) für die Verbrennungsluft angeschlossenen Brennkammer (1) beschrieben. Um vorteilhafte Verbrennungsbedingungen zu schaffen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Brennkammer (1) eine Blasdüse (4) für die Verbrennungsluft und daran anschließend ein Flammrohr (5) vorzugsweise mit einer Stauscheibe (6) aufweist und daß eine Mühle (8) für die stückeligen Brennstoffe mit einem in die Druck- oder Saugleitung (2) des Gebläses (3) mündenden Mahlgutaustritt (10) vorgesehen ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/10; F23D 1/00; F23K 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23D 1/00 (2006.01); F23G 5/033 (2006.01); F23G 7/10 (2006.01); F23L 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/105 (2013.01); F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23D 1/00 (2013.01); F23G 5/033 (2013.01); F23L 5/02 (2013.01); F23G 2201/80 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162405 A2 20011212; EP 1162405 A3 20020327; AT 409169 B 20020625; AT A9762000 A 20011015

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20051204

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040604

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23G 7/10 A, 7F 23K 3/02 B, 7F 23D 1/00 B, 7F 23C 9/06 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI