Global Patent Index - EP 1162408 A1

EP 1162408 A1 2001-12-12 - Oven with refractory bottom

Title (en)

Oven with refractory bottom

Title (de)

Ofen mit feuerfestem Boden

Title (fr)

Four à sole réfractaire

Publication

EP 1162408 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01490021 A

Priority

FR 0007437 A

Abstract (en)

The oven consists of a single chamber (9) with a bank of heating resistors (6,11) in the ceiling (9a) and (n) refractory heating plates (4,5...) mounted below in parallel. Each heating plate has it's own bank of heating resistors (7,8,11) located underneath and separated by a conducting plate. The distance (d) between the resistors and plate is adjustable so that upper and lower heating may be balanced for each plate

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/06; F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/06 (2006.01); F24C 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/087 (2013.01); F24C 7/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162408 A1 20011212; FR 2810102 A1 20011214; FR 2810102 B1 20030418

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040221

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031008

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT SE

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020523

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT SE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI