Global Patent Index - EP 1162411 A1

EP 1162411 A1 2001-12-12 - Ventilation/air conditioning device

Title (en)

Ventilation/air conditioning device

Title (de)

Luftwärme/Klimagerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de ventilation/climatisation

Publication

EP 1162411 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01113847 A

Priority

SE 0001198 W

Abstract (en)

The method of the ventilation and heating comprises pressure chamber (1) with connection of pipes (6) or hoses (7) enabling incoming airs to carry the heat carrying fluid. A socket (8) connects a computer (9) and jack to a telephone (10). The venting air is fed by separate means to incoming air with water containing radiators having a big surface end and cross flow. An Independent claim is also included for a method at a combined ventilation and heating system.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Luftwärme/Klimagerät (1) von geringer Tiefe, bei welchem Raumluft und/oder ggf. vorgewärmte Frischluft über vorzugsweise geräuscharme Düsen (2) in ein Gehäuse (3) derart einführbar ist, dass die Frischluft und/oder die Raumluft in vorgegebenem Verhältnis Raumluft : Frischluft von z. B. 2:1, durch das Gehäuse (3) unter Erwärmung oder Abkühlung an einem Wärmetauscherelement (4) vorbei hindurchgeführt und das Luftgemisch nach oben aus dem Gehäuse (3) in den zu erwärmenden oder zu kühlenden Raum abgegeben wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/01 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162411 A1 20011212; EP 1162411 B1 20050921; AT 305119 T 20051015; DE 50107463 D1 20051027; DK 1162411 T3 20060123; ES 2249354 T3 20060401

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180723

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170526

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2016-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 305119 T

- Effective date: 20160218

2015-11-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20151008 AND 20151014

2015-10-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150903

2015-10-02 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-10-02 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-07-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH

- Effective date: 20150702

2015-07-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL B.V., GRAVENHAGE, NL

- Document: DE 50107463

2015-07-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50107463

- Representative's name: KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2015-06-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL B.V., NL

2015-06-10 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-10 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-05-20 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PLUGGIT GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20150506

2015-05-15 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CP PTX DREIUNDSECHZIGSTE (63.) BETEILIGUNGS-GM, DE

- Effective date: 20150506

2009-08-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2009-08-14 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE VSP;ZWAENGIWEG 7;8038 ZUERICH (CH)

2009-04-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-01-05 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Free text: PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL N.V.#201 CARACASBAAIWEG#CURACAO (AN) -TRANSFER TO- PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL B.V.#LANGE VOORHOUT 82#2514 EJ S-GRAVENHAGE (DEN HAAG) (NL)

2008-12-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-12-05 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: PLUGGIT INTERNATIONAL B.V., NL

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060606

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-03 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2249354 T3

2006-01-23 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-01-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2006-01-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-12-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-12-21 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50107463 P 20051027

2005-10-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-09-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-09-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-04-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNHARDSSON, GORAN,

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020130

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI