Global Patent Index - EP 1162420 A1

EP 1162420 A1 2001-12-12 - Refrigerator

Title (en)

Refrigerator

Title (de)

Kühlschrank

Title (fr)

Réfrigérateur

Publication

EP 1162420 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01113056 A

Priority

IT MI20001275 A

Abstract (en)

A refrigerator comprises a compartment for preserving foods at a controlled temperature and positioned within a refrigerator cabinet which also comprises a compartment of temperature less than 0 DEG C. The refrigerator comprises an interspace (K) defined by a wall (1a) of the refrigeration compartment (1), and at least one air conduit to connect the compartment (H) of temperature less than 0 DEG C to the interspace (K) in order to cool the refrigeration compartment for preserving foods at a controlled temperature. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/06 (2006.01); F25D 11/02 (2006.01); F25D 21/14 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/065 (2013.01); F25D 11/02 (2013.01); F25D 21/14 (2013.01); F25D 23/069 (2013.01); F25D 2321/146 (2013.01); F25D 2400/02 (2013.01); F25D 2400/04 (2013.01); F25D 2400/16 (2013.01); F25D 2400/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162420 A1 20011212; BR 0102286 A 20020219; BR 0102286 B1 20090113; IT 1317963 B1 20030721; IT MI20001275 A1 20011210; IT MI20001275 D0 20000608

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20090409

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041221

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020521

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI