Global Patent Index - EP 1162422 A2

EP 1162422 A2 2001-12-12 - Process and device for argon recovery

Title (en)

Process and device for argon recovery

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de production d'argon

Publication

EP 1162422 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113953 A

Priority

DE 10028867 A

Abstract (en)

The sump liquid present in the crude argon column is partially vaporized. Recovering argon in an air decomposition plant comprises decomposing an oxygen stream rich in argon from a low pressure column (2) of a rectification column via a line in the crude argon column (5) equipped with conventional plates and/or fillers into crude argon and a first higher boiling liquid residual fraction; cooling the head of the crude argon column of a pressure column (1) thermally coupled to the low pressure column by indirect heat exchange with vaporizing sump liquid relieved to the pressure of the low pressure column; and decomposing the crude argon fed from the head of the crude argon column into a pure argon column into pure argon and a second lower boiling fraction. The sump liquid present in the crude argon column is partially vaporized. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for recovering argon.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon, bei dem verdichtete, vorgereinigte und abgekühlte Luft in einem Rektifiziersystem (1;2) mit mindestens einer Rektifiziersäule und einer Rohargonsäule (5) zerlegt wird, wobei ein aus der Niederdrucksäule (2) der Rektifiziersäule abgezogener argonhaltiger Sauerstoffstrom (3) in einer Rohargonsäule (5) in Rohargon (6) und in eine erste schwerersiedende flüssige Restfraktion (7) und der aus dem Kopf der Rohargonsäule (5) eine Reinargonsäule eingeleitete Rohargon (15) in Reinargonprodukt (18) und in eine zweite leichtersiedende Fraktion (17) zerlegt wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird dadurch, dass die in der Rohargonsäule (5) vorliegende Sumpfflüssigkeit (7) zumindest teilweise verdampft wird, die Anzahl der Rektifikationselemente in Form von konventionellen Böden und/oder geordneten Packungen und/oder Füllkörpern in der Rohargonsäule (5) derart verringert, dass durch die erzielte bauliche Einsparung eine kostengünstige Gewinnung von Argon mit 0,1 bis 10ppm Restsauerstoffgehalt gewährleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04727 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04678 (2013.01); F25J 3/04684 (2013.01); F25J 2235/58 (2013.01); F25J 2240/40 (2013.01); F25J 2290/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162422 A2 20011212; EP 1162422 A3 20020109; DE 10028867 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060425

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI