Global Patent Index - EP 1162423 A2

EP 1162423 A2 2001-12-12 - Process and device for argon recovery

Title (en)

Process and device for argon recovery

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de production d'argon

Publication

EP 1162423 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113970 A

Priority

DE 10028866 A

Abstract (en)

A separate rectification of an argon-oxygen mixture using recycled liquid from the crude argon column (10) is carried out in the low pressure column (1). Recovering argon in an air decomposition plant comprises decomposing compressed, pre-purified cooled air in a rectification system equipped with a rectification column and a crude argon column (10). An argon-oxygen mixture formed in a low pressure column (1) of the rectification system having rectifying devices and injected into the crude argon column equipped with rectification devices and a head condenser (14) is decomposed to crude argon head product and a sump liquid. A separate rectification of an argon-oxygen mixture using recycled liquid from the crude argon column (10) is carried out in the low pressure column (1). An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for recovering argon.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon, bei dem verdichtete, vorgereinigte und abgekühlte Luft in einem Rektifiziersystem mit mindestens einer Rektifiziersäule und einer Rohargonsäule zu Sauerstoff, Stickstoff und Argon zerlegt wird. Erfindungsgemäß wird dadurch, dass in der Niederdrucksäule (1) eine separate Rektizierung des Argon-Sauerstoff-Gemisches unter Verwendung von Rücklaufflüssigkeit der Rohargonsäule (10) erfolgt, der Argon-Anteil im Argon-Sauerstoff-Seitengas der Niederdrucksäule (1) bis auf 80 Vol.-% erhöht, wodurch der Argon-Sauerstoff-Trennungsaufwand in der Rohargonsäule (10) derart verringert wird, dass eine komplette Argonkolonne entfallen kann, wodurch eine kostengünstige und damit wirtschaftliche Argon-Gewinnung gewährleistet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04703 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04678 (2013.01); F25J 3/04921 (2013.01); F25J 3/04939 (2013.01); F25J 2235/58 (2013.01); F25J 2240/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162423 A2 20011212; EP 1162423 A3 20020612; DE 10028866 A1 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010612

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 25J 3/04 A, 7F 25J 3/02 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI