Global Patent Index - EP 1162424 A2

EP 1162424 A2 2001-12-12 - Process and device for argon recovery

Title (en)

Process and device for argon recovery

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de production d'argon

Publication

EP 1162424 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113971 A

Priority

DE 10028871 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure in a crude argon column is lower than the pressure in a low pressure column. Recovering argon in an air decomposition plant comprises decomposing an oxygen stream rich in argon from a low pressure column (2) of a rectification column in the crude argon column (5) equipped with conventional plates, packing and/or fillers into crude argon and a first higher boiling liquid residual fraction; cooling the head of the crude argon column thermally coupled to the low pressure column by indirect heat exchange with vaporizing sump liquid relieved to the pressure of the low pressure column, and decomposing the crude argon fed from the head of the crude argon column into a pure argon column into pure argon and a second lower boiling fraction. The pressure in the crude argon column is lower than the pressure in the low pressure column. An Independent claim is also included for an apparatus for recovering argon.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Argon, bei dem verdichtete, vorgereinigte und abgekühlte Luft in einem Rektifiziersystem mit mindestens einer Rektifiziersäule (1;2) und einer Rohargonsäule (5) zerlegt wird, wobei ein aus der Niederdrucksäule (2) der Rektifiziersäule abgezogener argonhaltiger Sauerstoff-strom (3) in einer Rohargonsäule (5) in Rohargon und in eine erste schwerersiedende flüssige Restfraktion (13) und das aus dem Kopf der Rohargonsäule (5) in eine Reinargon-säule (16) eingeleitete Rohargon (15) in Argon-Stickstoff-Gemisch (17) und in Reinargon (18) zerlegt wird. Erfindungsgemäß kann dadurch, dass die Rohargon-Rektifikation (5) in der Rohargonsäule (5) unter einem Druck von etwa 0,9 bis 1,1bar erfolgt, die Anzahl der Rektifikationseinrichtungen in Form von konventionellen Böden und/oder geordneten Packungen und/oder Füllkörpern in der Rohargonsäule (5) wesentlich verringert werden, wodurch eine kostengünstige Gewinnung von Argon mit 0,1 bis 10ppm Restsauerstoffgehalt in allen bekannten Luftzerlegungsanlagen möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04727 (2013.01); F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04678 (2013.01); F25J 3/04684 (2013.01); F25J 2235/58 (2013.01); F25J 2240/40 (2013.01); F25J 2290/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162424 A2 20011212; EP 1162424 A3 20020109; EP 1162424 B1 20090225; AT 423951 T 20090315; DE 10028871 A1 20011220; DE 50114720 D1 20090409

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090526

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090608

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-02-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2010-01-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-10-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-10-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-09-16 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2009-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-08-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-04-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50114720 P 20090409

2009-04-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2009-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2009-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-01-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AIR LIQUIDE AGS GMBH

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040311

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI