Global Patent Index - EP 1162428 A2

EP 1162428 A2 2001-12-12 - Method and device for igniting a warhead in a target tracking missile

Title (en)

Method and device for igniting a warhead in a target tracking missile

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zünden eines Gefechtskopfes bei zielverfolgenden Lenkflugkörpern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour allumer une tête de combat dans un missile suiveur de cible

Publication

EP 1162428 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01113715 A

Priority

DE 10028746 A

Abstract (en)

Actuating variables detected during the flight of a guided missile predict place of hit (28). Ignition delay time for a proximity fuse is adjusted according to the predicted place of hit and by devices for performing these procedural stages. Processing images in a homing head view finder estimates time-to-go. Connected to an ignition device section with delay tables, signals on first (30) and second (32) outputs measure a direct hit or near miss respectively.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Zünden eines Gefechtskopfes bei zielverfolgenden Lenkflugkörpern, die einen Aufschlagzünder und einen Annäherungszünder zum Zünden eines Gefechtskopfes aufweisen. Der Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zu Grunde, bei einem Lenkflugkörper mit Aufschlag- und Annäherungszünder die Zündung des Gefechtskopfes so zu bewirken, daß der Schaden an dem Ziel möglichst groß wird. Dies wird bevorzugt erreicht durch die Verfahrensschritte: Prädizieren der Trefferablage aus während des Fluges des Lenkflugkörpers erfaßten Einflußgrößen und Einstellen der Zündverzugszeit des Annäherungszünders nach Maßgabe der so prädizierten Trefferablage sowie durch die Mittel zur Durchführung dieser Verfahrensschritte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 13/00; F42C 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/14 (2006.01); F42C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 9/148 (2013.01); F42C 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162428 A2 20011212; EP 1162428 A3 20040225; EP 1162428 B1 20070822; DE 10028746 A1 20011213; DE 50112899 D1 20071004; US 2003047102 A1 20030313; US 6584906 B2 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-03-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: DIEHL DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO. KG, 88662 UEBERLINGEN, DE

- Document: DE 50112899

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080526

2007-12-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-11-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50112899 P 20071004

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2007-08-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-11-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040821

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-02-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI