Global Patent Index - EP 1162543 A2

EP 1162543 A2 2001-12-12 - A system for transferring data reusing a plurality of data transferring area cyclically

Title (en)

A system for transferring data reusing a plurality of data transferring area cyclically

Title (de)

Datenübertragungssystem zur zyklischen Wiederverwendung von einer Mehrzahl von Datenübertragungsbereich

Title (fr)

Système de transfert de données réutilisant cycliquement une pluralité de zones de transfert de données

Publication

EP 1162543 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01304940 A

Priority

JP 2000175536 A

Abstract (en)

A data transfer controller is provided which can reduce a CPU control load necessary for data transfer cyclically using a plurality of data transfer areas. A DMAC (3) constituting the data transfer controller is initially set with a transfer start address of a transfer source or transfer destination by a CPU (2), issues an interrupt (110, 111, 104) to CPU each time the data transfer responding to a transfer request from the transfer source reaches a predetermined data amount based upon the transfer start address, and initializes an address of the transfer source or transfer destination to the transfer start address each time the interrupt is issued predetermined plural times. After CPU sets once the data transfer conditions to DMAC, CPU can continue data processing by repetitively using a limited number of memory areas (MA, MB), without performing any process of repetitively setting the data transfer conditions necessary for a data transfer control for receiving voice data. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 12/02 (2006.01); G06F 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 13/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162543 A2 20011212; EP 1162543 A3 20041117; JP 2001350713 A 20011221; TW 518469 B 20030121; US 2002026551 A1 20020228

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090530

2009-02-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090119

2005-08-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENESAS TECHNOLOGY CORP.

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TTPCOM LIMITED

2005-05-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050311

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-11-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI