Global Patent Index - EP 1162578 A2

EP 1162578 A2 2001-12-12 - Coin sorting device with a sleeve as the coin collection container

Title (en)

Coin sorting device with a sleeve as the coin collection container

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Münzen mit einem als Hülsenbehälter ausgebildeten Münzenauffangbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tri pour pièces de monnaie avec un manchon comme réceptacle de collection des pièces

Publication

EP 1162578 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01250163 A

Priority

DE 20010040 U

Abstract (en)

The arrangement includes a coin conveyance arrangement, and a sorting plate following the coin conveyance arrangement, which comprises sorting apertures (3) for different coins of a coin collective. A coin outflow channel (4,4') is connected to each sorting aperture, and a sheath container (5) is connected to the output of the coin outflow channel. An individual sheath (6) is inserted in the sheath container, in such way, that output coins fall into the sheath. The coin outflow channel comprises a sheath input aperture (9) above the sheath container.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Münzen eines oder mehrerer Münzenkollektive mit einer Münzenzuführvorrichtung (1), mit einer an die Münzenzuführvorrichtung (1) anschließenden Sortierplatte(2), welche auf verschiedene Münzen eines Münzenkollektivs abgestimmte Sortieröffnungen (3) aufweist, wobei an jede Sortieröffnung (3) ein Münzenauslaufkanal (4,4') angeschlossen ist und wobei an dem Münzenauslaufkanal (4,4') auslaßseitig ein Hülsenbehälter (5) anschließbar ist, wobei eine einzelne Hülse (6) mit der Maßgabe in den Hülsenbehälter (5) einsetzbar ist, daß aus dem Münzenauslaufkanal (4,4') austretende Münzen in die Hülse (6) fallen. Um die Einführung einer Hülse einfach und sicher durchführen zu können, weist der Münzenauslaufkanal (4,4') oberhalb des angeschlossenen Hülsenbehälters (5) eine Hülseneinwurföffnung (9) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 3/02 (2006.01); G07D 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 3/02 (2013.01); G07D 9/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010040 U1 20000928; EP 1162578 A2 20011212; EP 1162578 A3 20040114; US 2002144878 A1 20021010; US 6626752 B2 20030930

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111201

2009-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090205

2004-10-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-01-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI