Global Patent Index - EP 1162637 A1

EP 1162637 A1 2001-12-12 - Disconnectable electrical contact device

Title (en)

Disconnectable electrical contact device

Title (de)

Trennbare elektrische Kontaktvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contact électrique sectionnable

Publication

EP 1162637 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 01420117 A

Priority

FR 0007242 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical contact unit has two conductor slabs (3,4) and a central conductor piece (5) forming contact. There are two cleaning strips (7,8) which are placed in front of the conductor slabs in the direction of movement of the central conductor strip scraping against each conductor piece face.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/42; H01R 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/42 (2006.01); H01H 1/60 (2006.01); H01R 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/60 (2013.01); H01H 1/42 (2013.01); H01R 43/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162637 A1 20011212; EP 1162637 B1 20070926; DE 60130603 D1 20071108; DE 60130603 T2 20080626; ES 2292551 T3 20080316; FR 2809873 A1 20011207; FR 2809873 B1 20021213; US 2002058438 A1 20020516; US 6495778 B2 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140518

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60130603

- Effective date: 20141202

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60130603

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130524

- Year of fee payment: 13

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130522

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100519

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100518

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100518

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090521

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080627

2008-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2292551 T3

2007-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60130603 P 20071108

2007-10-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070926

2007-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-09-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB FRANCE

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ENTRELEC

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI