Global Patent Index - EP 1162638 A2

EP 1162638 A2 2001-12-12 - Arrangement for illuminating a control knob of an input device by transparency

Title (en)

Arrangement for illuminating a control knob of an input device by transparency

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Beleuchtung des Stellknopfes eines Eingabeaggregates mittels Durchlicht

Title (fr)

Système d'illumination d'un bouton de manoeuvre d'un dispositif d'entrée de données par transparence

Publication

EP 1162638 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01112668 A

Priority

DE 20010428 U

Abstract (en)

The rotary adjustment knob (4) is used to operate switching elements within a housing (2). The housing is coupled to other equipment by a socket (5) and cable (12). The position of the knob is provided by illumination that is provided by an optical conductor (20) on the surface of a mounting plate (1).

Abstract (de)

Für einen an einer Trennwand (1) befestigten Drehschalter (7) wird vorgeschlagen den Stellknopf (4) mittels Durchlicht zu beleuchten, indem als Lichtleiter (20) ein konischer, mit in Achsrichtung angeformten Fortsätzen (29, 30, 31) ausgebildeter Ring (28) vorgesehen ist, wobei die Fortsätze (29, 30, 31) durch die Trennwand (1) hindurchgreifen und auf Leuchtdioden (8, 9) ausgerichtet sind, die sich auf einer dem Drehschalter (7) zugeordneten Leiterplatte (6) befinden. Der Lichtleiter (20) wird mittelbar durch Befestigen des Gehäuses (3) an der Trennwand (1) befestigt und ist durch geeignete Ausbuchtungen (47, 48, 49) in der Trennwand (1) gegen Verdrehen gesichert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/02; G05G 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/025 (2013.01); H01H 2011/0081 (2013.01); H01H 2219/062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2593618 A1 19870731 - GAGGENAU WERKE [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 20010428 U1 20000817; EP 1162638 A2 20011212; EP 1162638 A3 20040407; EP 1162638 B1 20120111; US 2002075668 A1 20020620; US 6685327 B2 20040203

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160525

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160525

2017-01-04 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160601

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-05-22 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50116032

2015-05-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-07 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50116032

- Effective date: 20121012

2012-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121012

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-04-18 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-03-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50116032

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-01-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2012-01-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH

2007-06-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070508

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-12-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20041004

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01H 19/02 A

2004-04-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 05G 1/10 B

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI