Global Patent Index - EP 1162640 A1

EP 1162640 A1 2001-12-12 - Arc extinguishing material

Title (en)

Arc extinguishing material

Title (de)

Löschmedium zum Löschen von Lichtbögen

Title (fr)

Matière d'extinction d'arc

Publication

EP 1162640 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00810495 A

Priority

EP 00810495 A

Abstract (en)

Agent for deleting electric arcs consists of a silicone polymer or a mixture of silicone polymers containing a mineral compound or a mixture of mineral compounds as filler.

Abstract (de)

Löschemedium in pastöser bis fester Form zum Löschen von Lichtbögen, bestehend aus einem Silikonpolymer oder einem Gemisch solcher Silikonpolymere, wobei das Silikonpolymer bzw. das Gemisch der Silikonpolymere als Füllstoff mindestens eine mineralische Verbindung oder ein Gemisch solcher Verbindungen in pulveriger Form, enthält; Verwendung des Löschmedium zum Löschen von Lichtbögen in Überstrom-Schutz-Elementen, in der Elektronik und Mikroelektronik; in der Hochspannungstechnik; oder in repetitiven Sicherungen, sowie elektrische Vorrichtungen, Geräte und Anlagen, welche ein erfindungsgemässes ein Löschmedium enthalten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/18; H01H 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/18 (2006.01); H01H 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/18 (2013.01); H01H 9/30 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31663 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162640 A1 20011212; AU 5012701 A 20011213; AU 774864 B2 20040708; NO 20012784 A 20011210; NO 20012784 D0 20010606; PL 196151 B1 20071231; PL 347881 A1 20011217; US 2002004547 A1 20020110; US 6645637 B2 20031111

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090106

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060512

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020508

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI