Global Patent Index - EP 1162644 A2

EP 1162644 A2 2001-12-12 - Slim tube funnel design with improved funnel

Title (en)

Slim tube funnel design with improved funnel

Title (de)

Design eines Trichters einer dünnen Röhre mit verbessertem Trichter

Title (fr)

Conception d'entonnoir de tube mince avec entonnoir amélioré

Publication

EP 1162644 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01113334 A

Priority

US 58710200 A

Abstract (en)

A cathode ray tube has a glass envelope including a faceplate panel; a neck end; and a funnel connected between the panel and the neck end. The funnel has a main body portion and a yoke region, with the main body portion including at least one reinforcement rib. The reinforcement rib includes a curved ridge bend in the funnel that is curved outward away from a vacuum side of said funnel. Alternatively, the reinforcement rib includes a curved mound-like increase in thickness of the funnel. The curved thickness can be directionally oriented inwardly towards the vacuum side, outwardly away from the vacuum side, or both. The reinforcement rib can extend along the funnel in a direction from the neck end towards the faceplate panel, along the funnel in a direction transverse to that from the panel to the neck end, or a combination of both. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/86; H01J 29/87

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/86 (2006.01); H01J 29/87 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/861 (2013.01); H01J 29/87 (2013.01); H01J 2229/8606 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162644 A2 20011212; EP 1162644 A3 20031105; CN 1328338 A 20011226; JP 2002033060 A 20020131; MX PA01005525 A 20030820

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-09-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-07-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-11-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-11-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI