Global Patent Index - EP 1162690 A2

EP 1162690 A2 2001-12-12 - Insulation displacement connector assembly for a sheathed electrical conductor

Title (en)

Insulation displacement connector assembly for a sheathed electrical conductor

Title (de)

Schneidklemmen-Verbindervorrichtung für einen umhüllten elektrischen Leiter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de connexion autodénudante pour un conducteur électrique gainé

Publication

EP 1162690 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 01420129 A

Priority

FR 0007460 A

Abstract (en)

The self stripping electrical cable mechanism has an interconnection piece with stripping and retention teeth (6) to cut the isolating sleeve and retain the cable center conductor. The unit is held in a casing (3) with a connection chamber (15) a gripping slot (16) grips the isolating sleeve. The gripping slot and the stripping slot are separated laterally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2429 (2013.01); H01R 13/5833 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162690 A2 20011212; EP 1162690 A3 20020515; EP 1162690 B1 20030924; CN 1213516 C 20050803; CN 1328359 A 20011226; DE 60100828 D1 20031030; DE 60100828 T2 20040408; ES 2208533 T3 20040616; FR 2810165 A1 20011214; FR 2810165 B1 20061006; US 2002031936 A1 20020314; US 6561840 B2 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160608

2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160607

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160607

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160607

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2208533 T3

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ABB ENTRELEC

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040114

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60100828 P 20031030

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-05-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 4/24 A, 7H 01R 13/58 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI