Global Patent Index - EP 1162702 A2

EP 1162702 A2 2001-12-12 - Pivotal power supply plug device

Title (en)

Pivotal power supply plug device

Title (de)

Schwenkbarer elektrischer Stecker

Title (fr)

Fiche électrique rotative

Publication

EP 1162702 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01202149 A

Priority

JP 2000169266 A

Abstract (en)

A pivotal power supply plug device having a compact and simple structure corresponding to 200 V of the European and U. S. standards and formed with a reduced number of parts can be provided. A plug supporting piece (10) is pivotably provided on one end side of an insertion plug storing recess (3) provided at a surface of a housing (1). Insertion plugs (11, 11) made of a metal conductive material are supported at the plug supporting piece (10) and projected therefrom. A contact (19) in electrical connection with each insertion plug (11) is provided at the bottom surface (10b) of the plug supporting piece (10). Each contact (19) is contacted to a connection terminal (20) in the housing (1) when the plug supporting piece (10) is upraised together with the insertion plugs (11, 11). The insertion plugs (11, 11) are pushed down together with the plug supporting piece (10) and stored into the recess (3). A stopper projection (31) is provided at a bottom surface (10a) of the plug supporting piece (10) and is urged by a spring (36) in the projecting direction and allowed to advance/retract. A stopper operation knob (34) for operating the stopper projection (31) in the retracting direction is provided on a surface of the plug supporting piece (10). The housing (1) includes a stopper engagement portion (30) to which the stopper projection (31) engages when the insertion plugs (11) are upraised. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/46 (2006.01); H01R 13/502 (2006.01); H01R 33/06 (2006.01); H01R 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 33/06 (2013.01); H01R 35/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1162702 A2 20011212; EP 1162702 A3 20030319; JP 2001351719 A 20011221; JP 3459943 B2 20031027

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030920

2004-01-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/06 A

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 35/04 B

2003-03-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/66 B

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI