Global Patent Index - EP 1162886 A1

EP 1162886 A1 2001-12-19 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING AGENTS WHICH PREVENT OXIDATIVE DAMAGE

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EVALUATING AGENTS WHICH PREVENT OXIDATIVE DAMAGE

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR EVALUIERUNG VON STOFFEN, DIE OXIDATIVE SCHÄDIGUNG VERHINDERN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE D'EVALUATION D'AGENTS DE PREVENTION DES DESTRUCTIONS OXYDATIVES

Publication

EP 1162886 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00910266 A

Priority

  • US 0004438 W
  • US 12141899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0049876A1] An in vitro system for identifying agents capable of inhibiting or preventing oxidative damage in a mouse fibroblast culture derived from a transgenic mouse capable of expressing human elastin promoter which generates reactive oxygen species within the mouse fibroblast culture is provided. A method for identifying agents capable of inhibiting or preventing oxidative damage via this system is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A61K 38/43; A61K 38/44; A61K 38/54; C12N 5/00; C12N 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); A01K 67/0278 (2013.01); G01N 33/5008 (2013.01); G01N 33/502 (2013.01); G01N 33/5044 (2013.01); A01K 2207/15 (2013.01); A01K 2217/00 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/03 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0393 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0049876 A1 20000831; AU 3238800 A 20000914; AU 760969 B2 20030522; CA 2362904 A1 20000831; EP 1162886 A1 20011219; EP 1162886 A4 20030212; JP 2002541774 A 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040225

2003-02-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHARLES RIVER LABORATORIES

2002-04-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHARLES RIVER LABORATORIES

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHARLES RIVER LABORATORIES

2002-04-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHARLES RIVER LABORATORIES

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE