Global Patent Index - EP 1162887 A4

EP 1162887 A4 2003-06-25 - RECOMBINANT ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS TRANSFER OF GENES AFFECTING DEMYELINATION

Title (en)

RECOMBINANT ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS TRANSFER OF GENES AFFECTING DEMYELINATION

Title (de)

REKOMBINANTER ADENO-ASSOZIIERTER VIRUS TRANSFER VON DIE DEMYELINATION BEEINFLUSSENDEN GENEN

Title (fr)

TRANSFERT DE GENES PAR VIRUS ADENO-ASSOCIE RECOMBINE INFLUANT SUR LA DEMYELINISATION

Publication

EP 1162887 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00914979 A

Priority

  • US 0006839 W
  • US 12439899 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054595A1] Disclosed are methods for the use of recombinant adeno-associated virus compositions. In particular, the use of catalase- or superoxide dismutase-expressing rAAV constructs in compositions for delivery to the optic nerve is disclosed. Also disclosed are methods for the treatment and amelioration of symptoms of demyelinating disorders of an animal, such as multiple sclerosis, allergic encephaloneuritis and optic neuritis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 63/00; A01N 43/04; C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/09; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/864 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/86 (2013.01); C12N 2750/14143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9534670 A2 19951221 - CHILDRENS HOSPITAL INC [US]
  • [XY] WO 9528493 A1 19951026 - UNIV ROCKEFELLER [US], et al
  • [Y] VAN DER VEEN ROEL C ET AL: "Contrasting roles for nitric oxide and peroxynitrite in the peroxidation of myelin lipids.", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, vol. 95, no. 1-2, 1 March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 1 - 7, XP001120096, ISSN: 0165-5728
  • [Y] QI XIAOPING ET AL: "Increase of manganese superoxide dismutase, but not of Cu/Zn-SOD, in experimental optic neuritis.", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE, vol. 38, no. 6, 1997, pages 1203 - 1212, XP009001342, ISSN: 0146-0404
  • [A] ROSEN D R ET AL: "Mutations in copper-zinc superoxide dismutase gene are associated with familial amyotrophic lateral sclerosis", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, vol. 362, no. 6415, 1993, pages 59 - 62, XP002204594, ISSN: 0028-0836
  • [A] ROWLAND L P: "Amyotrophic lateral sclerosis: human challenge for neuroscience.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. UNITED STATES 28 FEB 1995, vol. 92, no. 5, 28 February 1995 (1995-02-28), pages 1251 - 1253, XP002237399, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [PX] GUY J ET AL: "rAAV mediated gene transfer of catalase suppresses optic neuritis in transgenic ECSOD mice sensitized for experimental allergic encephalomyelitis (EAE).", IOVS, vol. 40, no. 4, 15 March 1999 (1999-03-15), Annual Meeting of the Association for Research in Vision and Ophthalmology;Fort Lauderdale, Florida, USA; May 9-14, 1999, pages S446, XP009001280
  • [T] GUY J ET AL: "Viral mediated gene transfer of MnSOD suppresses, while Cu/Zn SOD exacerbates experimental optic neuritis.", IOVS, vol. 41, no. 4, 15 March 2000 (2000-03-15), Annual Meeting of the Association for Research in Vision and Ophthalmology.;Fort Lauderdale, Florida, USA; April 30-May 05, 2000, pages S129, XP001119816
  • See also references of WO 0054595A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054595 A1 20000921; AU 3629200 A 20001004; CA 2367648 A1 20000921; EP 1162887 A1 20011219; EP 1162887 A4 20030625

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061003

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041110

2003-06-25 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030509

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI