Global Patent Index - EP 1162966 A1

EP 1162966 A1 2001-12-19 - WEIGHT LOSS AFTER PREGNANCY

Title (en)

WEIGHT LOSS AFTER PREGNANCY

Title (de)

GEWICHTSVERLUST NACH SCHWANGERSCHAFT

Title (fr)

PERTE DE POIDS APRES UNE GROSSESSE

Publication

EP 1162966 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00921401 A

Priority

  • US 0007202 W
  • US 12514999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056317A1] A compound of formula (I) or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof in which R1 and R2 are independently H or methyl (for example <u>N</u>,<u>N</u>-dimethyl-1-[1-(4-chlorophenyl)cyclobutyl]-3-methylbutyl amine hydrochloride optionally in the form of its monohydrate) is used for aiding weight loss after pregnancy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/135

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 3/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/135 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01); C07C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/135 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); C07C 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056317 A1 20000928; AU 4172900 A 20001009; BG 105995 A 20020628; BR 0009078 A 20011226; CA 2367268 A1 20000928; CN 1352553 A 20020605; CZ 20013282 A3 20020717; EP 1162966 A1 20011219; EP 1162966 A4 20020612; HU 0200500 A2 20020828; IL 145243 D0 20020630; JP 2002539253 A 20021119; MX PA01009465 A 20040319; NO 20014474 A 20011114; NO 20014474 D0 20010914; NZ 514015 A 20010928; PL 351080 A1 20030310; SK 13362001 A3 20020702; TR 200102694 T2 20020422; ZA 200107680 B 20030618

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020902

2002-06-12 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/135 A, 7A 61K 31/137 B, 7A 61P 3/04 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KNOLL GMBH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010919;LV PAYMENT 20010919;RO PAYMENT 20010919;SI PAYMENT 20010919