Global Patent Index - EP 1163011 A2

EP 1163011 A2 2001-12-19 - FATTY ACID-ANTICANCER CONJUGATES AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

FATTY ACID-ANTICANCER CONJUGATES AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

FETTSÄURE-ANTIKREBS-KONJUGATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

CONJUGUES D'ACIDES GRAS ET D'AGENTS ANTICANCEREUX, ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 1163011 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00916188 A

Priority

  • US 0006160 W
  • US 26530799 A
  • US 18615200 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0053231A2] The invention provides conjugates of fatty acids and anticancer agents useful in treating cancer, and compositions and formulations thereof. Methods for using the conjugates are also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 47/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/337 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/542 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0053231A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0053231 A2 20000914; WO 0053231 A3 20011004; AU 3733300 A 20000928; CA 2366723 A1 20000914; CA 2366723 C 20110802; CN 1377282 A 20021030; CZ 20013123 A3 20020313; EP 1163011 A2 20011219; JP 2002538224 A 20021112; RU 2001127313 A 20030920

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111124

2011-10-28 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1040486

2008-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071218

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI