Global Patent Index - EP 1163016 A2

EP 1163016 A2 2001-12-19 - NANOCOMPOSITE SURGICAL MATERIALS AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM

Title (en)

NANOCOMPOSITE SURGICAL MATERIALS AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THEM

Title (de)

CHIRURGISCHE NANOKOMPOSIT-MATERIALIEN UND DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX CHIRURGICAUX NANOCOMPOSITES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1163016 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00918531 A

Priority

  • US 0008703 W
  • US 12724499 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057932A2] Nanocomposite surgical materials, such as cements, having very fine heterogenous structure are formed by incorporating into a polymeric matrix a well dispersed solid, liquid or gaseous filler having an average mass diameter ranging from about 750 nanometers to about 1 nanometer. The average ligament thickness of the surgical composite cements ranges from about 750 nanometers to about 1 nanometer. Methods and apparatus for avoiding air contact during the preparation and transfer of a cement to an in vivo side are described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61L 24/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61L 24/00 (2006.01); A61L 27/44 (2006.01); A61L 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61L 31/128 (2013.01); A61L 24/0089 (2013.01); A61L 27/446 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057932 A2 20001005; WO 0057932 A3 20010208; AU 3932700 A 20001016; AU 772507 B2 20040429; CA 2366377 A1 20001005; EP 1163016 A2 20011219; JP 2002539894 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-06 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1039905

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021210

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021210

2002-03-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61L 24/00 A, 7A 61L 27/44 B, 7A 61L 31/12 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE