Global Patent Index - EP 1163029 A2

EP 1163029 A2 2001-12-19 - NITRATE ESTERS AND THEIR USE FOR INDUCING NEUROPROTECTION AND COGNITION ENHANCEMENT

Title (en)

NITRATE ESTERS AND THEIR USE FOR INDUCING NEUROPROTECTION AND COGNITION ENHANCEMENT

Title (de)

NITRATEN ESTER UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR NEUROPROTEKTION UND WAHRNEHMUNGSSTEIGERUNG

Title (fr)

ESTERS DE NITRATE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT D'ETATS NEUROLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 1163029 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00910456 A

Priority

  • CA 0000280 W
  • US 26737999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0054756A2] Compounds and methods for mitigating neurodegeneration, effecting neuroprotection and/or effecting cognition enhancement in a subject are described. Neurological or cognitive conditions are treated by administering to a subject an effective amount of a therapeutic compound comprising a nitrate ester, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt or ester thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61P 25/00; A61K 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/21 (2006.01); A61K 31/255 (2006.01); A61K 31/26 (2006.01); A61K 31/275 (2006.01); A61K 31/34 (2006.01); A61K 31/341 (2006.01); A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/385 (2006.01); A61K 31/39 (2006.01); A61K 31/426 (2006.01); A61K 31/506 (2006.01); A61K 31/513 (2006.01); A61K 31/575 (2006.01); A61K 31/662 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 39/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 203/04 (2006.01); C07C 255/14 (2006.01); C07C 317/18 (2006.01); C07C 323/12 (2006.01); C07C 327/28 (2006.01); C07C 331/10 (2006.01); C07C 381/02 (2006.01); C07D 277/24 (2006.01); C07D 307/33 (2006.01); C07D 327/04 (2006.01); C07D 333/48 (2006.01); C07D 339/08 (2006.01); C07D 411/04 (2006.01); C07F 9/09 (2006.01); C07F 9/40 (2006.01); C07J 9/00 (2006.01); C07J 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 307/33 (2013.01); A61K 31/21 (2013.01); A61K 31/255 (2013.01); A61K 31/26 (2013.01); A61K 31/275 (2013.01); A61K 31/341 (2013.01); A61K 31/381 (2013.01); A61K 31/39 (2013.01); A61K 31/426 (2013.01); A61K 31/506 (2013.01); A61K 31/575 (2013.01); A61K 31/662 (2013.01); A61K 31/7068 (2013.01); C07C 203/04 (2013.01); C07C 255/14 (2013.01); C07C 317/18 (2013.01); C07C 323/12 (2013.01); C07C 327/28 (2013.01); C07C 331/10 (2013.01); C07C 381/02 (2013.01); C07D 277/24 (2013.01); C07D 327/04 (2013.01); C07D 333/48 (2013.01); C07D 339/08 (2013.01); C07D 411/04 (2013.01); C07F 9/091 (2013.01); C07F 9/4006 (2013.01); C07J 41/0061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054756A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0054756 A2 20000921; WO 0054756 A3 20010125; AT 546195 T 20120315; AU 3267300 A 20001004; AU 783036 B2 20050915; CA 2364493 A1 20000921; CA 2364493 C 20100831; EP 1163029 A2 20011219; EP 1163029 B1 20120222; IL 145367 D0 20020630; JP 2002539152 A 20021119; MX PA01009246 A 20040326; US 2002016311 A1 20020207; US 2002147234 A1 20021010; US 2002177622 A1 20021128; US 6310052 B1 20011030; US 6365579 B2 20020402; US 6677374 B2 20040113; US 6916835 B2 20050712

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160315

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160315

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60046946

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-09-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140315

2015-01-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140315

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120315

2013-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20130830

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-10-31 [PGRI IE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Effective date: 20130905

2013-06-19 [REG IE NE4A] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120602

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60046946

- Effective date: 20121123

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120315

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2013-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121123

2013-01-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-09-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120528

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 546195 T

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-08-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120523

2012-08-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120622

2012-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-06-20 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHNEIDER FELDMANN AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE

2012-06-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60046946

- Representative's name: GRAPE & SCHWARZENSTEINER, DE

2012-04-12 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 60046946

- Effective date: 20120412

2012-03-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2012-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 546195 T

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2012-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020704

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020704

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011015

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI