Global Patent Index - EP 1163057 A1

EP 1163057 A1 2001-12-19 - DEVICE FOR EJECTING LIQUID DROPS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR EJECTING LIQUID DROPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR TROPFENERZEUGUNG

Title (fr)

DIPOSITIF D'EJECTION DE GOUTTES DE LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1163057 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00911001 A

Priority

  • FR 0000684 W
  • FR 9903589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2791280A1] The invention concerns a device for ejecting liquid drops comprising: a shape-retaining body (28) provided with a cavity, filled with said liquid (20), and with at least an outlet (18) for the liquid; means for transmitting to the liquid sufficient impulse for ejecting at least one drop (26), said means comprising means for striking (23) a wall (30) of said body (28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B05B 1/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/02 (2006.01); B05C 5/00 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B05B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/02 (2013.01); B05B 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056463A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2791280 A1 20000929; FR 2791280 B1 20010413; DE 60002841 D1 20030626; DE 60002841 T2 20040122; EP 1163057 A1 20011219; EP 1163057 B1 20030521; JP 2002539965 A 20021126; US 6722580 B1 20040420; WO 0056463 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140320

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140320

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60002841

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60002841

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-12-31 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1163057E

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002841 P 20030626

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE