Global Patent Index - EP 1163061 A1

EP 1163061 A1 2001-12-19 - EMBOSSING DEVICE FOR TWO-DIMENSIONALLY EXPANDED MATERIAL

Title (en)

EMBOSSING DEVICE FOR TWO-DIMENSIONALLY EXPANDED MATERIAL

Title (de)

PRÄGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLÄCHENHAFT AUSGEDEHNTES MATERIAL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE GAUFRAGE POUR MATERIAU PLAN

Publication

EP 1163061 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912620 A

Priority

  • EP 00912620 A
  • EP 0002398 W
  • EP 99810255 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056475A1] The embossing rolls (1, 4) of embossing devices (14) that are used for processing two-dimensionally expanded material, especially in the packaging industry, can be exchangeably configured if they are mounted in suitable exchanger units (2). An exchanger unit can be configured, for example, as a tube (2) with terminal locating surfaces (8, 9). The stand (13) of an embossing device (14) has corresponding seats (11, 12) that are adapted to the respective exchanger unit (2) with high precision. The embossing roll (1, 4) that is received in an exchanger unit (2) is thus in its working position once it is inserted and the locating surfaces (8, 9) of the fixing elements are received by the pertaining seats (11, 12) and no further adjustment needs to be carried out. Especially the driven embossing roll (1) of such an embossing device (14) can be exchanged with substantially less effort, which makes it possible to quickly perform maintenance work and rearrange the production.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/08; B21B 31/02; B31F 1/07; B31F 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 50/88 (2017.01); B21B 31/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/08 (2006.01); B31F 1/07 (2006.01); B31F 1/28 (2006.01); F16C 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/07 (2013.01); B21B 31/02 (2013.01); B21B 31/08 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0723 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0753 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0776 (2013.01); B31F 2201/0779 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056475 A1 20000928; AT 238851 T 20030515; AU 3430200 A 20001009; AU 772818 B2 20040506; BR 0009191 A 20011218; CA 2367423 A1 20000928; CA 2367423 C 20080527; CN 1126656 C 20031105; CN 1267595 A 20000927; DE 50001966 D1 20030605; DK 1163061 T3 20030721; EP 1048369 A1 20001102; EP 1163061 A1 20011219; EP 1163061 B1 20030502; ES 2195880 T3 20031216; HK 1031358 A1 20040227; JP 2002539966 A 20021126; JP 2012153144 A 20120816; JP 5000806 B2 20120815; PT 1163061 E 20030930; RU 2250829 C2 20050427; ZA 200107352 B 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180316

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ANDRE ROLAND S.A., CH

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040318

2004-03-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2195880 T3

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402410

2003-08-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030715

2003-07-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001966 P 20030605

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020304

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE