Global Patent Index - EP 1163063 A4

EP 1163063 A4 2002-09-04 - HARDENED STEEL SECURITY MATERIALS

Title (en)

HARDENED STEEL SECURITY MATERIALS

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSMATERIAL AUS GEHÄRTETEM STAHL

Title (fr)

MATERIAUX DE SECURITE EN ACIER TREMPE

Publication

EP 1163063 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00904691 A

Priority

  • AU 0000048 W
  • AU PP836199 A
  • AU PQ130199 A
  • AU PQ193099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0044511A1] A hardened steel bar, sheet, plate or other shaped material suitable for security purposes is formed from a nitridable steel which has been subjected to austenitization, oil quenching, tempering and then nitriding to provide a hardened steel material having a surface hardness of at least about 50 HRC (Hardness Rockwell "C").

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 37/00; C21D 1/18; C21D 9/00; C21D 9/08; C22C 38/18; C22C 38/22; C23C 8/26; E06B 9/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/22 (2006.01); C23C 8/02 (2006.01); C23C 8/26 (2006.01); E06B 9/01 (2006.01); C21D 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 8/26 (2013.01); C22C 38/06 (2013.01); C22C 38/22 (2013.01); C23C 8/02 (2013.01); E06B 9/01 (2013.01); C21D 1/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] GB 621890 A 19490421 - NITRALLOY CORP
  • [A] EDITED BY J. R. DAVIS: "Carbon and alloy steels", March 1996, ASM INTERNATIONAL, USA, XP002200887
  • [A] EDITED BY F. BRIAN PICKERING: "Constitution and properties of steels", 1992, VCH, WEINHEIM, XP002200888
  • See also references of WO 0044511A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0044511 A1 20000803; EP 1163063 A1 20011219; EP 1163063 A4 20020904

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030929

2002-09-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21C 37/00 A, 7C 21D 1/18 B, 7C 21D 9/00 B, 7C 21D 9/08 B, 7C 22C 38/18 B, 7E 06B 9/01 B, 7C 22C 38/22 B, 7C 23C 8/26 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE