Global Patent Index - EP 1163082 A1

EP 1163082 A1 2001-12-19 - ANGLE GRINDER

Title (en)

ANGLE GRINDER

Title (de)

WINKELSCHLEIFER

Title (fr)

MEULEUSE D'ANGLE

Publication

EP 1163082 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00987167 A

Priority

  • DE 0004082 W
  • DE 10000700 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE10000700A1] The invention relates to an angle grinder, in particular, whose housing is more economically produced in that it is comprised of a motor housing (1) and of a gearbox housing (2), whereby a recess (20) is provided on the end of the gearbox housing (2) that can be connected to the motor housing (1), and first and second ribs (100; 110) of the motor housing (1) can be brought into contact with said recess. This results in simplifying the method for mounting the gearbox housing (2) onto the motor housing (1) by virtue of the fact that fewer mounting steps are necessary.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 23/02; B25F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/028 (2013.01); B25F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151249A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 10000700 A1 20010712; CN 1174835 C 20041110; CN 1349445 A 20020515; DE 50015362 D1 20081030; EP 1163082 A1 20011219; EP 1163082 B1 20080917; WO 0151249 A1 20010719

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101118

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101118

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50015362 P 20081030

2008-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2008-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040826

2006-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040826

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WALZ, ROLAND

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STIERLE, PETER

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DAMMERTZ, RALPH

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SULEA, MARIA-MARGARETA

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HEESS, STEFAN

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI