Global Patent Index - EP 1163111 A1

EP 1163111 A1 2001-12-19 - METHOD OF REDUCING THE VOLUME OF EMPTY PACKAGING AND COMPRESSION DEVICE FOR EMPTY PACKAGING

Title (en)

METHOD OF REDUCING THE VOLUME OF EMPTY PACKAGING AND COMPRESSION DEVICE FOR EMPTY PACKAGING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VOLUMENREDUZIERUNG VON LEERGUT SOWIE PRESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR LEERGUT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LA REDUCTION DU VOLUME D'EMBALLAGES VIDES AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION POUR EMBALLAGES VIDES

Publication

EP 1163111 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920514 A

Priority

  • DE 19912059 A
  • EP 0002434 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19912059A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for compressing empty packaging waste. The compression stroke is characterized by three different possibly positions and the compression device is situated on or above a container for collecting empty packaging.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 9/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 9/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/08 (2013.01); B30B 9/321 (2013.01); Y10S 100/902 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0054965A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19912059 A1 20001005; EP 1163111 A1 20011219; EP 1163111 B1 20030716; US 6684762 B1 20040203; WO 0054965 A1 20000921; WO 0054965 A9 20010920

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-07-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-07-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040419

2004-02-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-01-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-10-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031027

2003-08-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002906 P 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-07-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-16 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-07-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030716

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE