Global Patent Index - EP 1163158 A1

EP 1163158 A1 2001-12-19 - APPARATUS FOR SEALING PACKAGING CONTAINERS

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR SEALING PACKAGING CONTAINERS

Title (de)

APPARAT ZUM VERSIEGELN VON BEHÄLTERN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR SCELLER DES RECIPIENTS D'EMBALLAGE

Publication

EP 1163158 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99908532 A

Priority

  • JP 4555798 A
  • US 9904305 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943557A2] An apparatus (31) and method for sealing a sealing area (P1) of a packaging container (73) in which the sealing area (P1) has a predetermined exterior shape. The apparatus (31) includes a generator (36), a horn (35) and an anvil (23). The anvil (23) has an abutting portion (56) that conforms to the exterior shape of the sealing area (P1) of the packaging container (73). The plurality of slidable plates (71) may be composed of a ferromagnetic material, a paramagnetic material or a ceramic material. The plurality of slidable plates are supported on an elastic sleeve (63) that allows for the inward movement of the plates (71) when the force exerted by the horn (35) on the sealing area (P1) exceeds the elastic force of the sleeve (63) thereby allowing the corresponding plurality of slidable plates (71) to conform to the exterior shape of the sealing area (P1) of the packaging container (73). An electromagnet (75) may be used to restrict the movement of the slidable plates (71) subsequent to their conforming to the exterior shape of the sealing area (P1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/00; B29C 65/00; B29C 65/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/10 (2006.01); B29C 65/00 (2006.01); B29C 65/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 65/08 (2013.01); B29C 66/346 (2013.01); B29C 66/73921 (2013.01); B29C 66/80 (2013.01); B29C 66/8126 (2013.01); B29C 66/81413 (2013.01); B29C 66/81427 (2013.01); B29C 66/81461 (2013.01); B29C 66/81611 (2013.01); B29C 66/71 (2013.01); B29C 66/72321 (2013.01); B29C 66/72328 (2013.01); B29C 66/72341 (2013.01); B29C 66/81264 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0008 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B29C 66/71 + B29K 2023/06

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943557 A2 19990902; WO 9943557 A3 20050120; AU 2793999 A 19990915; EP 1163158 A1 20011219; EP 1163158 A4 20050202; JP H11240514 A 19990907

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090728

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090305

2005-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANEKO, MASAMICHI

2005-03-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RABE, MAGNUS

2005-03-09 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2005-02-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-11-03 [D17D] PUBLICATION OF THE DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2004-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 65D 1/00 A

2004-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 65/08 B

2004-10-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 65/00 B

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE