Global Patent Index - EP 1163178 A1

EP 1163178 A1 2001-12-19 - DEVICE FOR CONNECTING MATERIAL WEBS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONNECTING MATERIAL WEBS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN VON MATERIALBAHNEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE RELIER DEUX BANDES DE MATIERE

Publication

EP 1163178 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00903653 A

Priority

  • DE 19913581 A
  • DE 19923097 A
  • DE 19935687 A
  • EP 0000696 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056645A1] Devices of the prior art connect the end of an unwinding material web (42) to the front end (43) of a new roller (1) when material webs (4), especially paper webs or cardboard webs, are unwound. Said devices are provided with a device (16) for separating the web (4) and a device (6) for holding the end of the unwinding web (42). According to the invention, the holding device (6) is fixedly arranged on the web side of the unwinding material web (4) and is provided with two holding elements (7, 8) that are arranged at a distance from each other and in the running direction of the web. A device (12) for separating the web and applying an adhesive tape is mounted on the other side of the web and can be moved against the holding device (6). The device (12) for separating the web and applying an adhesive tape contains at least one apparatus (17) for applying the adhesive tape and at least one separating knife (16) that moves through the web level and into the spacing between the two holding elements (7, 8) when said device (12) moves against the holding device (6). The front end (43) of a new roller (1) is received by a web transport device (37) at the circumference of the roller (1) and is moved behind the area of the holding device (6). The device enables a buttsplice. The two webs are connected thereby without overlapping.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/10 (2006.01); B65H 19/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/1878 (2013.01); B65H 19/105 (2013.01); B65H 19/1852 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4607 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46176 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4622 (2013.01); B65H 2301/46222 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4631 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4641 (2013.01); B65H 2301/522 (2013.01); B65H 2406/33 (2013.01); B65H 2406/341 (2013.01); B65H 2406/3432 (2013.01); B65H 2801/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056645A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056645 A1 20000928; AT 252044 T 20031115; EP 1163178 A1 20011219; EP 1163178 B1 20031015

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100130

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-06-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004073 P 20031120

2003-11-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010511

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE