Global Patent Index - EP 1163181 A1

EP 1163181 A1 2001-12-19 - DYNAMIC BRAKING SYSTEM WITH SPEED CONTROL FOR AN ELEVATOR CAB

Title (en)

DYNAMIC BRAKING SYSTEM WITH SPEED CONTROL FOR AN ELEVATOR CAB

Title (de)

DYNAMISCHE BREMSVORRICHTUNG MIT GESCHWINDIGKEITSREGELUNG FÜR AUFZUGSKABINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FREINAGE DYNAMIQUE A CONTROLE DE VITESSE POUR UNE CABINE D'ASCENSEUR

Publication

EP 1163181 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00986354 A

Priority

  • ES 9902809 A
  • US 0033762 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0146056A1] An elevator braking system of an elevator system having an elevator cab is presented. The braking system comprises a motor having a shaft coupled to the elevator cab. The motor generating AC power in response to movement of the cab. A first rectifier circuit having a first AC input and a first DC output, is electrically connected to the motor at the first AC input. A braking circuit having a resistive element and switching device is connected in series across the first DC output. The switching device shunts the resistive element across the DC output in response to a fault condition to dynamically brake the elevator cab. Advantageously, this slows the speed of the cab during a movement operation necessitated from the fault condition. Therefore allowing the movement of passengers to any level below or above the stop, depending on an unbalanced condition of the cab and a counterweight. In an alternative embodiment the resistive element comprises a variable resistor. The elevator braking system may further comprise a sensor to provide a sensed signal indicative of the speed of the cab, wherein value of the variable resistor is varied based on the sensed signal. This advantageously provides regulation of the speed of the cab.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0146056A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0146056 A1 20010628; EP 1163181 A1 20011219; ES 2186461 A1 20030501; ES 2186461 B2 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-02-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI