Global Patent Index - EP 1163252 A2

EP 1163252 A2 2001-12-19 - COMPOSITIONS, KITS, AND METHODS RELATING TO THE HUMAN FEZ1 GENE, A NOVEL TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENE

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS, KITS, AND METHODS RELATING TO THE HUMAN FEZ1 GENE, A NOVEL TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENE

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, KITS UND VERFAHREN IN VERBINDUNG MIT DEM MENSCHLICHEN FEZ1-GEN, EINEM NEUEN TUMORSUPRESSORGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS, KITS ET PROCEDES CONCERNANT LE GENE FEZ1 DE L'HOMME, NOUVEAU GENE SUPPRESSEUR DES TUMEURS

Publication

EP 1163252 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00912007 A

Priority

  • US 0004950 W
  • US 12153799 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0050565A2] The invention relates to isolated polynucleotides homologous with a portion of one strand of the human tumor suppressor gene, FEZ1, and to the tumor suppressor protein encoded thereby, Fez1. The polynucleotides are useful, for example, as probes, primers, portions of expression vectors, and the like. The invention also includes diagnostic, therapeutic, cell proliferation enhancement, and screening methods which involve these polynucleotides and protein. The invention further includes kits useful for performing the methods of the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/47

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 35/76 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/82 (2006.01); C07K 16/32 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); G01N 33/574 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4703 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0050565 A2 20000831; WO 0050565 A3 20001207; CA 2361396 A1 20000831; EP 1163252 A2 20011219; EP 1163252 A4 20040407; JP 2003508011 A 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2009-03-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080902

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051012

2004-04-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-04-07 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: COMPOSITIONS, KITS, AND METHODS RELATING TO THE HUMAN FEZ1 GENE, A NOVEL TUMOR SUPPRESSOR GENE

2004-03-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/47 A

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE