Global Patent Index - EP 1163296 B1

EP 1163296 B1 2004-12-01 - METHOD OF TREATING METALS USING UREIDO SILANES AND MULTI-SILYL-FUNCTIONAL SILANES IN ADMIXTURE

Title (en)

METHOD OF TREATING METALS USING UREIDO SILANES AND MULTI-SILYL-FUNCTIONAL SILANES IN ADMIXTURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLEN MIT EINER MISCHUNG VON UREIDO-SILANEN UND MULTISILYLIERTEN FUNKTIONELLEN SILANEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES METAUX FAISANT APPEL AUX UREIDO SILANES ET AUX SILANES FONCTIONNELS MULTI-SILYLES EN ADJUVANT

Publication

EP 1163296 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 00901796 A

Priority

  • GB 0000350 W
  • US 24560299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0046311A1] The present invention relates to a method of metal treatment, particularly a method of metal treatment in order to improve corrosion resistance. The method comprises applying a solution containing one or more ureido silanes in admixture with one or more multi-silyl-functional silanes to a metal substrate. The method is particularly suitable for use on cold-rolled steel, zinc, iron, aluminium and aluminium alloy surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 4/00; C09D 183/14; C23C 22/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/24 (2006.01); B05D 1/36 (2006.01); B05D 7/14 (2006.01); C09D 4/00 (2006.01); C09D 183/04 (2006.01); C09D 183/14 (2006.01); C23C 22/50 (2006.01); C23C 22/53 (2006.01); C23C 22/56 (2006.01); C23F 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/56 (2013.01); C09D 4/00 (2013.01); C09D 183/14 (2013.01); C23C 22/50 (2013.01); C23C 22/53 (2013.01); C23C 2222/20 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C09D 4/00 + C08G 77/00
  2. C09D 4/00 + C08G 77/26

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0046311 A1 20000810; AT 283900 T 20041215; AU 2309300 A 20000825; CA 2360637 A1 20000810; CN 1164690 C 20040901; CN 1353744 A 20020612; DE 60016390 D1 20050105; DE 60016390 T2 20051027; DK 1163296 T3 20050321; EP 1163296 A1 20011219; EP 1163296 B1 20041201; ES 2231155 T3 20050516; JP 2002536159 A 20021029; JP 4138253 B2 20080827; US 6106901 A 20000822; US 6361592 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170209

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60016390

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60016390

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2014-01-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60016390

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-11-30 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2231155 T3

2005-03-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-02-04 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-02-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60016390 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030804

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI