Global Patent Index - EP 1163316 A1

EP 1163316 A1 2001-12-19 - NON-PHOSPHOROUS, NON-METALLIC ANTI-WEAR COMPOUND AND FRICTION MODIFIER

Title (en)

NON-PHOSPHOROUS, NON-METALLIC ANTI-WEAR COMPOUND AND FRICTION MODIFIER

Title (de)

NICHT-PORÖSE UND NICHT-METALLISCHE ANTI-VERSCHLEISS-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FRIKTIONSVERÄNDERER

Title (fr)

COMPOSE ANTI-USURE NON METALLIQUE, NON PHOSPHOREUX ET MODIFICATEUR DE FROTTEMENT

Publication

EP 1163316 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00905819 A

Priority

  • US 0002248 W
  • US 23401999 A
  • US 29906899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0042134A1] There is disclosed a friction reducing compound, comprising an intermediate adduct of a first moiety reacted in a first reaction with a second moiety to form the intermediate adduct and further esterifying or amidifying the intermediate adduct with a third moiety in a molar ratio of from about 1:2 to about 2:1, wherein the first moiety is an unsaturated synthetic dieneophilic base oil, wherein the second moiety is a compound having a diene conjugated carbon-carbon double bond and a carboxylic acid moiety or anhydride group, wherein the first reaction comprises mixing the first moiety with the second moiety in a molar ratio of from about 1:2 to about 2:1 under an inert atmosphere; and wherein the third moiety is a polyhydroxy compound.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 105/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/12 (2006.01); C07C 69/75 (2006.01); C10M 105/42 (2006.01); C10M 129/68 (2006.01); C10M 129/76 (2006.01); C10M 133/38 (2006.01); C10M 135/04 (2006.01); C10M 135/06 (2006.01); C10M 135/32 (2006.01); C10M 137/02 (2006.01); C10M 137/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01); C10N 40/08 (2006.01); C10N 40/20 (2006.01); C10N 40/22 (2006.01); C10N 40/25 (2006.01); C10N 40/32 (2006.01); C10N 50/10 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

C10M (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 10/08 (2013.01); C10L 1/191 (2013.01); C10L 1/198 (2013.01); C10M 159/12 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10N 2230/06 (2013.01); C10N 2230/74 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/40 (2013.01); C10N 2250/021 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 2207/022 + C10M 2207/122 + C10M 2207/283 + C10N 2220/026
  2. C10M 2207/022 + C10M 2207/122 + C10M 2207/40 + C10N 2220/026

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0042134 A1 20000720; AU 2744300 A 20000801; AU 772125 B2 20040408; CA 2359788 A1 20000720; CA 2359788 C 20100330; EP 1163316 A1 20011219; EP 1163316 A4 20030528; IL 144261 D0 20020523; JP 2002534590 A 20021015; NZ 513014 A 20030530

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-05 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080923

2003-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-28 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030414

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 105/42 A

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 69/75 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 129/76 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 159/12 B

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 159/12 J

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 129:74 J

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 129:32 J

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10M 129:06 J

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10N 30/06 K

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10N 40:04 K

2003-05-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10N 40:25 K

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WILLIAMSON, WILL, F.

2002-03-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RHODES, BLAINE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE