Global Patent Index - EP 1163319 A1

EP 1163319 A1 2001-12-19 - FABRIC MAINTENANCE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CERTAIN CATIONICALLY CHARGED FABRIC MAINTENANCE POLYMERS

Title (en)

FABRIC MAINTENANCE COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CERTAIN CATIONICALLY CHARGED FABRIC MAINTENANCE POLYMERS

Title (de)

WÄSCHEWASCHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND BESTIMMTEN KATIONISCH GELADENEN FARBSTOFFERHALTENDEN POLYMER

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS D'ENTRETIEN DES TISSUS CONTENANT CERTAINS POLYMERES D'ENTRETIEN DES TISSUS CHARGES CATIONIQUEMENT

Publication

EP 1163319 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00918421 A

Priority

  • US 0008030 W
  • US 12607299 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056849A1] The present invention relates to laundry detergent compositions providing dye protection benefits to fabric comprising: a) from about 4 % to about 70 % by weight, of a surfactant; b) from about 0.01 % by weight, of a dye maintenance polymer or oligomer, said polymer or copolymer comprising one or more linearly polymerizing monomers, cyclically polymerizing monomers, and mixtures thereof; and c) the balance carriers and adjunct ingredients.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 1/62; C11D 3/36; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06L 1/12 (2006.01); C08F 216/00 (2006.01); C08F 218/04 (2006.01); C08F 220/00 (2006.01); C08F 226/06 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/30 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06M 15/21 (2006.01); D06M 15/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/30 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3769 (2013.01); C11D 3/3773 (2013.01); C11D 3/3792 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056848A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056849 A1 20000928; AR 023155 A1 20020904; AR 023156 A1 20020904; AT 295405 T 20050515; AU 3923400 A 20001009; AU 3923500 A 20001009; BR 0009279 A 20011226; CA 2365282 A1 20000928; CA 2365282 C 20070130; CA 2365303 A1 20000928; CA 2365303 C 20070327; CN 1280391 C 20061018; CN 1351644 A 20020529; DE 60020091 D1 20050616; DE 60020091 T2 20060309; EP 1163319 A1 20011219; EP 1163319 B1 20050511; EP 1163320 A1 20011219; ES 2242612 T3 20051116; JP 2002540250 A 20021126; JP 2002540301 A 20021126; JP 4601829 B2 20101222; MX PA01009728 A 20020314; WO 0056848 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-11-08 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170401

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170308

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160307

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130324

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2006-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060324

2006-03-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2242612 T3

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-08-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-08-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050811

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60020091 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-05-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-05-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-05-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050511

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031217

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI