Global Patent Index - EP 1163370 A2

EP 1163370 A2 2001-12-19 - TRANSPOSON-BASED GENETIC MARKER

Title (en)

TRANSPOSON-BASED GENETIC MARKER

Title (de)

AUF TRANSPOSON BASIERENDER GENETISCHER MARKER

Title (fr)

NOUVEAU TYPE DE MARQUEUR GENETIQUE A BASE DE TRANSPOSON

Publication

EP 1163370 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00913997 A

Priority

  • CA 0000351 W
  • US 12746099 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0060113A2] The present invention relates to the use of DNA primers homologous to MITE in a method for detecting polymorphisms of a nucleic acid sequence. The method comprises the steps of amplifying nucleic acid sequences using a first primer homologous to a MITE in combination with another primer homologous or not to a MITE, separating fragments of the nucleic acid sequences amplified, and analyzing the fragments obtained in relation to reference fragments obtained from amplification of a nucleic acid sequence with the primer homologous to MITE for determining polymorphism in the nucleic acid sequence. DNA primers homologous to MITE may also be used in genotyping, fingerprinting, mapping or cloning method in accordance with the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6809 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6827 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0060113A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0060113 A2 20001012; WO 0060113 A3 20010405; AU 3547800 A 20001023; CA 2371128 A1 20001012; CN 1351671 A 20020529; CZ 20013532 A3 20020313; EP 1163370 A2 20011219; HU 0201423 A2 20020828; HU 0201423 A3 20041228; JP 2002540799 A 20021203; PL 351816 A1 20030616; RU 2279482 C2 20060710

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1044025

2006-04-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051001

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021119

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MCGILL UNIVERSITY

2002-02-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DNA LANDMARKS INC.

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUREAU, THOMAS

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CHANG, RUYING

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: O'DONOUGHUE, LOUISE, STEPHANIE

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LANDRY, BENOIT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011001

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI