Global Patent Index - EP 1163371 A2

EP 1163371 A2 2001-12-19 - METHODS FOR PURIFYING DNA USING IMMOBILIZED CAPTURE PROBES

Title (en)

METHODS FOR PURIFYING DNA USING IMMOBILIZED CAPTURE PROBES

Title (de)

METHODEN ZUR DNS-AUFREINIGUNG MITTELS FANGPROBEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES DE PURIFICATION D'ADN A L'AIDE DE SONDES DE CAPTURE IMMOBILISEES

Publication

EP 1163371 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00915885 A

Priority

  • US 0004939 W
  • US 25946799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0050644A2] Methods employing purification devices comprising an electrophoretic medium containing immobilized capture probes for the purification of DNA are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 1/34 (2006.01); G01N 35/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 1/405 (2013.01); C12N 15/101 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6806 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6869 (2013.01); G01N 2035/1053 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C12Q 1/6806 + C12Q 2565/519 + C12Q 2565/125

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0050644A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0050644 A2 20000831; WO 0050644 A3 20010405; AU 3708300 A 20000914; CA 2369002 A1 20000831; EP 1163371 A2 20011219; JP 2002537778 A 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050927

2005-05-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050316

2003-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXACT SCIENCES CORPORATION

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EXACT SCIENCES CORPORATION

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ADAMS, CHRISTOPHER, P.

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOLES, T., CHRISTIAN/ APOGENT DISCOVERIES/MATRIX

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEIR, LAWRENCE

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DHANDA, RAHUL, K.

2002-06-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SUMMERS, NEVIN, M.

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE