Global Patent Index - EP 1163372 A1

EP 1163372 A1 2001-12-19 - CHEMICALLY REACTIVE PLANE-RIGIDIZED CYANINE DYES AND THEIR DERIVATIVES

Title (en)

CHEMICALLY REACTIVE PLANE-RIGIDIZED CYANINE DYES AND THEIR DERIVATIVES

Title (de)

CHEMISCH REAKTIVE IN EINER EBENE ERSTARRTE CYANINFARBSTOFFE SOWIE DERIVATE

Title (fr)

COLORANTS A BASE DE CYANINE RIGIDIFIES DANS UN PLAN ET CHIMIQUEMENT REACTIFS, ET DERIVES DE CES DERNIERS

Publication

EP 1163372 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00919582 A

Priority

  • US 0007783 W
  • US 12583999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056933A1] The invention describes novel plane-rigidized cyanine near-infrared (NIR) fluorescent dyes, their methods of preparation and use in the non-isotopic labeling of biological molecules. Such dyes contain a central cyclic hydroanthraquinone framework which provides for a stable and rigid structure to ensure low reactivity with neighboring molecules, a sharp absorption band, a high quantum yield, and emissions in a region largely devoid of natural background auto-fluorescence. Such dyes further comprise variable end groups flanking the central cyclic framework, allowing formation of a number of different plane-rigidized dyes, each having a slightly different emission wavelength. Functional groups are provided for attachment to target biological molecules. Moreover, hydrophilic functional groups are provided where necessary to significantly increase the water solubility of the dye molecules.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C12P 19/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 23/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09B 23/0066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056933 A1 20000928; AU 4024500 A 20001009; EP 1163372 A1 20011219; EP 1163372 A4 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030806

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020820

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A, 7C 12P 19/34 B, 7C 07H 21/00 B, 7G 01N 33/533 B, 7C 09B 23/00 B

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI