Global Patent Index - EP 1163385 A1

EP 1163385 A1 2001-12-19 - BIAS-BOUND FABRIC, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND WEAVING MACHINE FOR CONTINUOUSLY MAKING SUCH A FABRIC

Title (en)

BIAS-BOUND FABRIC, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME AND WEAVING MACHINE FOR CONTINUOUSLY MAKING SUCH A FABRIC

Title (de)

SCHRÄGES GEWEBE, VERFAHREN UND WEBMASCHINE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN GEWEBES

Title (fr)

TISSU EN BIAIS, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET METIER A TISSER POUR LA FABRICATION EN CONTINU D'UN TEL TISSU

Publication

EP 1163385 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00911023 A

Priority

  • FR 0000710 W
  • FR 9903696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2791365A1] The invention concerns a fabric characterised in that it is in the shape of a finite web of length (L) and width (I), consisting of interlaced yarns, woven along respective directions (D and d) oblique relatively to the length (L) and whereof none has a knotting, even for an infinite length of the web. The invention is applicable to fabrics designed for technical use based on flat yarns.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 13/00; D03D 41/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 25/00 (2006.01); D03D 13/00 (2006.01); D03D 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 13/002 (2013.01); D03D 41/00 (2013.01); D03D 41/008 (2013.01); Y10S 139/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056965A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2791365 A1 20000929; FR 2791365 B1 20010622; AT 266753 T 20040515; CA 2366296 A1 20000928; CA 2366296 C 20081028; DE 60010676 D1 20040617; DE 60010676 T2 20050210; EP 1163385 A1 20011219; EP 1163385 B1 20040512; JP 2002540306 A 20021126; JP 4567205 B2 20101020; US 6494235 B1 20021217; WO 0056965 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180306

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040809

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60010676 P 20040617

2004-06-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HEXCEL REINFORCEMENTS

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040512

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT