Global Patent Index - EP 1163396 A1

EP 1163396 A1 2001-12-19 - SOIL-COMPACTOR WITH POWER STEERING

Title (en)

SOIL-COMPACTOR WITH POWER STEERING

Title (de)

BODENVERDICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT SERVOSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMPACTAGE DE SOL A SERVOCOMMANDE

Publication

EP 1163396 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920532 A

Priority

  • DE 19913074 A
  • EP 0002512 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0056984A1] At the end of a guide handle (7) of a vibration plate serving as soil-compactor an actuating element (8) is mounted which can be moved in relation to the guide handle (7). Each position of the actuating element (8) is detected by a sensor device (11) which transmits a corresponding signal to a hydraulic steering unit (10). In this way the phase angles of unbalance masses (3, 4) can be modified which in turn influences the direction of travel of the vibration plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/074; B60K 26/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/38 (2006.01); E02D 3/074 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/38 (2013.01); E02D 3/074 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056984A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0056984 A1 20000928; DE 19913074 A1 20001019; DE 19913074 C2 20010726; EP 1163396 A1 20011219; EP 1163396 B1 20041027; JP 2003524714 A 20030819; US 8123432 B1 20120228

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160322

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008421

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50008421

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008421

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008421

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50008421

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG

- Free text: WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2009-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON SE

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER NEUSON SE#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

- Free text: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG#PREUSSENSTRASSE 41#80809 MUENCHEN (DE)

2005-10-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050728

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008421 P 20041202

2004-12-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-10-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI SE

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI SE

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE