Global Patent Index - EP 1163409 A1

EP 1163409 A1 2001-12-19 - POKER VIBRATOR WITH FREQUENCY CONVERTER

Title (en)

POKER VIBRATOR WITH FREQUENCY CONVERTER

Title (de)

INNENRÜTTLER MIT FREQUENZUMFORMER

Title (fr)

PERVIBRATEUR DOTE D'UN CONVERTISSEUR DE FREQUENCE

Publication

EP 1163409 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00912496 A

Priority

  • DE 19913305 A
  • EP 0001429 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913305A1] The invention relates to a poker vibrator for compressing concrete. The poker vibrator comprises a vibrating housing (1) that accommodates an unbalanced mass and an electromotor, an insulating plastic tube (2) that links the vibrating housing (1) to a switch cover (3), an electric cable (7) that links the switch cover (3) to a connector shell (9) and a frequency converter that supplies the current for the electromotor. The poker vibrator is characterised in that at least parts of the components pertaining to the poker vibrator are arranged in the vibrating housing (1), the insulating plastic tube (2) or the connector shell (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/02 (2006.01); B06B 1/16 (2006.01); E04G 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/16 (2013.01); E04G 21/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056999A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913305 A1 20001012; DE 19913305 C2 20030102; DE 19964444 B4 20080626; DE 50013664 D1 20061207; EP 1163409 A1 20011219; EP 1163409 B1 20061025; JP 2002540322 A 20021126; US 2003198123 A1 20031023; US 6619832 B1 20030916; US 6733169 B2 20040511; WO 0056999 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140222

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-12-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013664

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140223

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140222

2014-09-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50013664

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130222

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130315

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120426 AND 20120502

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 50013664

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013664

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50013664

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-01-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20111205

2009-12-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-12-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2007-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-04-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013664 P 20061207

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2006-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061025

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE