Global Patent Index - EP 1163410 A1

EP 1163410 A1 2001-12-19 - POOL CLEANER

Title (en)

POOL CLEANER

Title (de)

SCHWIMMBECKENREINIGER

Title (fr)

NETTOYEUR DE BASSIN

Publication

EP 1163410 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99952046 A

Priority

  • ZA 9900097 W
  • ZA 9900070 A
  • ZA 9902058 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0040826A1] A pool cleaner which includes a body (10), at least one passage (40) which extends through the body with an inlet (42) on the passage (40) and an outlet (44) from the passage at respective opposed ends of the passage having a minimum cross-sectional area at a position selected from the inlet (42), the outlet (44), and a location between the inlet and the outlet, the cross-sectional area of the passage in each direction extending away the said selection position towards each respective end (36, 38) of the passage monotonically increasing in magnitude.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 4/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 4/1663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0040826A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0040826 A1 20000713; AU 6434899 A 20000724; AU 759119 B2 20030403; CN 1134580 C 20040114; CN 1344345 A 20020410; DE 69913205 D1 20040108; DE 69913205 T2 20040909; DE 69913205 T8 20060209; EP 1163410 A1 20011219; EP 1163410 B1 20031126; ES 2212855 T3 20040801

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090919

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69913205

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070918

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080912

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212855 T3

2004-06-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MOCANI (PTY) LTD.

2004-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20031126

2004-04-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913205 P 20040108

2003-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-11-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUPRA, CARL, FREDERICK, WILHELM

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI