Global Patent Index - EP 1163414 A1

EP 1163414 A1 2001-12-19 - FRAME SWINGING ON TWO DIRECTIONS ORTHOGONAL TO EACH OTHER, IN PARTICULAR OF THE WINDOW FRAME TYPE

Title (en)

FRAME SWINGING ON TWO DIRECTIONS ORTHOGONAL TO EACH OTHER, IN PARTICULAR OF THE WINDOW FRAME TYPE

Title (de)

IN ZWEI ZUEINANDER ORTHOGONALEN RICHTUNGEN DREHBARER RAHMEN, INSBESONDERE DES FENSTERRAHMENTYPES

Title (fr)

BASCULEMENT DE CADRE, EN PARTICULIER DU TYPE CADRE DE FENETRE SUR DEUX DIRECTIONS ORTHOGONALES ENTRE ELLES

Publication

EP 1163414 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 01907455 A

Priority

  • EP 0100466 W
  • IT PN20000005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0153639A1] Frame swinging on two directions orthogonal to each other, in particular of the window frame type, comprising a control handle, first driving means (45) associated with the handle (46) for providing for the selective displacement of the frame inner framework (6), together with the frame (7), into an outer case (8) on at least a first, a second and a third operative position thereof, in which said inner framework (6) is pivoted respectively around a horizontal axis of rotation, a vertical axis of rotation, and both the horizontal and vertical axes of rotation; and comprising second driving means (47) associated with a further control handle (48) and a movable section (10), interposed between said inner framework (6) and said outer case (8) and co-operating therewith. Such further handle (48) is structured for preventing or permitting the inner framework (6) to be operated either in the opening or closing position thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/48 (2013.01); E05D 2015/487 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0153639A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 0153639 A1 20010726; AT 301229 T 20050815; AU 3542501 A 20010731; DE 60112364 D1 20050908; DE 60112364 T2 20060720; EP 1163414 A1 20011219; EP 1163414 B1 20050803; ES 2247062 T3 20060301; HK 1044181 A1 20060602; IT PN20000005 A1 20010723; RO 120152 B1 20050930; SK 14052001 A3 20020509; SK 287061 B6 20091007

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100118

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2011-04-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2011-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100118

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100719

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100117

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100117

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-10-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100117

2010-08-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MURA S.R.L.

- Effective date: 20100131

2010-07-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100719

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090122

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-06-02 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1044181

2006-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2247062 T3

2006-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. CARLO GAGGINI

2005-11-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60112364 P 20050908

2005-09-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-08-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: LT;LV;RO;SI