Global Patent Index - EP 1163427 A1

EP 1163427 A1 2001-12-19 - GAS TURBINE ROTOR WITH INTERNALLY-COOLED GAS TURBINE BLADE

Title (en)

GAS TURBINE ROTOR WITH INTERNALLY-COOLED GAS TURBINE BLADE

Title (de)

GASTURBINENROTOR MIT INNENRAUMGEKÜHLTER GASTURBINENSCHAUFEL

Title (fr)

ROTOR DE TURBINE A GAZ DOTE D'UNE AUBE A REFROIDISSEMENT INTERNE

Publication

EP 1163427 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00920496 A

Priority

  • EP 00920496 A
  • EP 0002209 W
  • EP 99105683 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057031A1] The invention relates to a gas turbine rotor with an internally cooled gas turbine blade (1) which has a blade foot (2) and a blade platform (5), said blade platform having recesses (10) into which strip inserts (11) are introduced. The aim of the invention is to configure a gas turbine rotor of this type in such a way that the seal that is provided to prevent hot gas from entering and cold air from leaving and the fixing means of the gas turbine blade (1) can be produced simply and inexpensively while still being very reliable. To this end, the recess (10) extends as far as a plate-end base (13) of the blade platform (5) and the strip insert (11) has a positive fit on the plate (4) which prevents axial displacement in a direction of use (30) of the gas turbine blade (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/00; F01D 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/3015 (2013.01); F01D 11/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057031A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057031 A1 20000928; DE 50004724 D1 20040122; EP 1163427 A1 20011219; EP 1163427 B1 20031210; JP 2003526039 A 20030902; US 6561764 B1 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090313

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080317

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004724 P 20040122

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE