Global Patent Index - EP 1163430 A1

EP 1163430 A1 2001-12-19 - COVERING ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT WITH A COVERING ELEMENT AND A SUPPORT STRUCTURE

Title (en)

COVERING ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT WITH A COVERING ELEMENT AND A SUPPORT STRUCTURE

Title (de)

ABDECKELEMENT UND ANORDNUNG MIT EINEM ABDECKELEMENT UND MIT EINER TRAGSTRUKTUR

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE REVETEMENT ET SYSTEME COMPORTANT UN ELEMENT DE REVETEMENT ET UNE STRUCTURE SUPPORT

Publication

EP 1163430 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00916951 A

Priority

  • EP 00916951 A
  • EP 0002296 W
  • EP 99105944 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0057033A1] The invention relates to a covering element (2) for protecting components, especially components in a gas turbine (1), in a machine that is subjected to high thermal stress. The covering element (2) is provided with a wall (8) with a hot side (10) which can be exposed to a hot medium (M) and a cold side (12) which is opposite the hot side (10). The cold side (12) is provided with a cooling surface (14) that can be subjected to a coolant (K). Holding elements (28) are provided on the cold side (12). The invention also relates to an arrangement with a covering element (2) and with a support structure (34). The arrangement is tolerant with respect to thermal expansion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 25/24; F01D 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/08 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/08 (2013.01); F01D 25/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057033A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0057033 A1 20000928; CA 2366357 A1 20000928; DE 50003360 D1 20030925; EP 1163430 A1 20011219; EP 1163430 B1 20030820; JP 2002540337 A 20021126; US 6602050 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070315

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070315

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070315

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50003360 P 20030925

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE