Global Patent Index - EP 1163442 A1

EP 1163442 A1 2001-12-19 - FUEL INJECTION NOZZLE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION NOZZLE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZDÜSE

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 1163442 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 01903592 A

Priority

  • DE 0100016 W
  • DE 10000574 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0151806A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection nozzle comprising a nozzle body which is provided with at least one nozzle hole (12) and a conical bearing surface (14). The inventive nozzle also comprises a nozzle needle (16) which can be displaced in the nozzle body and is provided with an inlet surface (18) as well as a radial step (20) arranged downstream in relation to and adjacent to the inlet surface. A sealing seat is thus formed in the transitional area with the inlet surface. Said sealing seat can engage with the bearing surface. The aim of the invention is to meter fuel for the pre-injection in a more accurate manner. According to the invention, an angle that is enclosed between the centre line of the injection nozzle and a tangent which is adjacent to the radial step in the area of the sealing seat amounts to more than 45 DEG . A circumference groove (24) is formed downstream in relation to and adjacent to the radial step. Said groove extends at least to the nozzle hole (12) in such a way that the narrowest cross-section is produced between the nozzle needle and the nozzle body in the region of the sealing seat for pre-injection purposes when the nozzle needle performs an opening lift movement.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0151806A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0151806 A1 20010719; BR 0103895 A 20011218; CN 1188591 C 20050209; CN 1358256 A 20020710; DE 10000574 A1 20010719; EP 1163442 A1 20011219; EP 1163442 B1 20050706; JP 2003519758 A 20030624; PL 349996 A1 20021021; US 2003057299 A1 20030327

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060407

2006-04-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-08-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50106669 P 20050811

2005-07-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-07-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-07-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2005-07-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050706

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR