Global Patent Index - EP 1163454 A1

EP 1163454 A1 2001-12-19 - HYDRAULIC PILOT CONTROL

Title (en)

HYDRAULIC PILOT CONTROL

Title (de)

HYDRAULISCHE VORSTEUERUNG

Title (fr)

COMMANDE PILOTE HYDRAULIQUE

Publication

EP 1163454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910754 A

Priority

  • DE 19913276 A
  • EP 0001790 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19913276A1] The invention relates to a hydraulic pilot control comprising two control outputs (96, 97) which can be impinged upon by a control pressure and a hydraulic pilot control device which has a lever (81) that can be moved from a neutral position in a first and second direction. The hydraulic pilot control also comprises a pressure valve (69) which can be adjusted by displacing the lever from the neutral position. In a control pilot of this type, it should be possible to adjust the symmetrical behaviour of the pilot pressure used to displace the control lever in said two directions in a simple manner. To this end, the invention provides that the pressure valve can be adjusted in the same way, for both a displacement of the lever in the first direction and a displacement of the lever in the second direction. A directional valve (73) connects a regulating output (80) of the pressure valve to the first control output (96) or to the second control output (97), depending on the direction in which the lever is displaced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/042; F16K 31/524; G05G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/44 (2006.01); F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/042 (2006.01); F15B 13/07 (2006.01); F16K 11/07 (2006.01); F16K 17/06 (2006.01); F16K 31/44 (2006.01); G05G 1/04 (2006.01); G05G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66D 1/44 (2013.01); F15B 13/0406 (2013.01); F15B 13/0422 (2013.01); F15B 13/07 (2013.01); G05G 1/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/86654 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87169 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0057067A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19913276 A1 20000928; EP 1163454 A1 20011219; EP 1163454 B1 20040107; JP 2002540353 A 20021126; NO 20014575 A 20010920; NO 20014575 D0 20010920; US 6481461 B1 20021119; WO 0057067 A1 20000928

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-04 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20061123

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-03-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060303

2006-03-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060302

2005-05-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2004-12-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20041005

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-04-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004983 P 20040212

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB NL SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOSCH REXROTH AG

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE