Global Patent Index - EP 1163510 A1

EP 1163510 A1 2001-12-19 - CALIBRATING A Nox-SENSOR

Title (en)

CALIBRATING A Nox-SENSOR

Title (de)

KALIBRIERUNG EINES NOx-SENSORS

Title (fr)

ETALONNAGE D'UN DETECTEUR DE Nox

Publication

EP 1163510 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00910727 A

Priority

  • DE 19911664 A
  • EP 0001663 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19911664A1] The invention relates to a method for determining the concentration of NOx in the flow of exhaust gas of an internal combustion engine using a NOx sensor, whereby the sensor is calibrated using selected operating points. Preferably, exactly one selected motor operating point is used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/417

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/26 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); G01N 27/417 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/2474 (2013.01); F02D 41/146 (2013.01); F02D 41/2441 (2013.01); G01N 27/4175 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0055614A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19911664 A1 20000921; CN 1222768 C 20051012; CN 1343309 A 20020403; EP 1163510 A1 20011219; JP 2002539448 A 20021119; JP 4535357 B2 20100901; WO 0055614 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-07 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110729

2011-07-29 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE