Global Patent Index - EP 1163514 A4

EP 1163514 A4 2002-09-18 - AN $i(IN VIVO) AND $i(IN VITRO) MODEL FOR CUTANEOUS PHOTOAGING AND OXIDATIVE DAMAGE

Title (en)

AN $i(IN VIVO) AND $i(IN VITRO) MODEL FOR CUTANEOUS PHOTOAGING AND OXIDATIVE DAMAGE

Title (de)

IN VIVO UND INVITRO MODELL FÜR DIE LICHTÄLTERUNG UND DURCHLICHTENTSTANDENOXIDATIVE SCHÄDIGUNG DER HAUT

Title (fr)

MODELE IN VIVO ET IN VITRO POUR PHOTOVIEILLISSEMENT CUTANE ET DESTRUCTION OXYDATIVE

Publication

EP 1163514 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 00911941 A

Priority

  • US 0004703 W
  • US 12026999 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0050892A1] Transgenic hairless mice which express a full length or truncated human elastin promoter and fibroblast cultures derived from these transgenic mice are provided. Also provided are methods of identifying compounds capable of inhibiting cutaneous photodamage with these transgenic hairless mice or fibroblast cultures derived from these mice. In addition, an in vitro system for identifying agents capable of inhibiting or preventing oxidative damage in these mice fibroblast culture wherein reactive oxygen species are generated within the mouse fibroblast culture and a method for identifying agents which prevent oxidative damage are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/00; A01K 67/027; C12N 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); A61K 49/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/85 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/8509 (2013.01); A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); A01K 67/0278 (2013.01); A61K 49/0004 (2013.01); A61K 49/0008 (2013.01); A01K 2207/15 (2013.01); A01K 2217/00 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2227/105 (2013.01); A01K 2267/03 (2013.01); A01K 2267/0393 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5602304 A 19970211 - SUZUKI HIROSHI [JP], et al
  • [X] FRIJHOFF ANITA F W ET AL: "UVB-induced mutagenesis in hairless lambda lacZ-transgenic mice.", ENVIRONMENTAL AND MOLECULAR MUTAGENESIS, vol. 29, no. 2, 1997, pages 136 - 142, XP002206321, ISSN: 0893-6692
  • [A] DE GRUIJL FRANK R ET AL: "UV-induced skin cancer in a hairless mouse model.", BIOESSAYS, vol. 17, no. 7, 1995, pages 651 - 660, XP002206322, ISSN: 0265-9247
  • [A] BERNSTEIN E F ET AL: "Evaluation of sunscreens with various sun protection factors in a new transgenic mouse model of cutaneous photoaging that measures elastin promoter activation", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY, C.V. MOSBY, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, vol. 37, no. 5, PART 1, November 1997 (1997-11-01), pages 725 - 729, XP002117296, ISSN: 0190-9622
  • [A] TAKEUCHI T ET AL: "A NOVEL IN VIVO MODEL FOR EVALUATING AGENTS THAT PROTECT AGAINST ULTRAVIOLET A-INDUCED PHOTOAGING", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 110, April 1998 (1998-04-01), pages 343 - 347, XP000995139, ISSN: 0022-202X
  • [DA] YOSHIHARU KAWAGUCHI ET AL: "EFFECT OF REACTIVE OXYGEN SPECIES ON THE ELASTIN MRNA EXPRESSION INCULTURED HUMAN DERMAL FIBROBLASTS", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, XX, vol. 23, no. 1, 1997, pages 162 - 165, XP002927177, ISSN: 0891-5849
  • [DA] KAHARI V-M ET AL: "DELETION ANALYSES OF 5'-FLANKING REGION OF THE HUMAN ELASTIN GENE", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 265, no. 16, 5 June 1990 (1990-06-05), pages 9485 - 9490, XP001022233, ISSN: 0021-9258
  • See also references of WO 0050892A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0050892 A1 20000831; AU 3375400 A 20000914; AU 761728 B2 20030605; CA 2362585 A1 20000831; EP 1163514 A1 20011219; EP 1163514 A4 20020918; JP 2002542764 A 20021217

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031023

2002-09-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020802

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHARLES RIVER LABORATORIES

2002-04-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERNSTEIN, ERIC F.

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE